CA SB240 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1722, 14020, 14022, 14022.5, 14023, 14037, and 14065 of, and to add Sections 14046, 14047, and 14064.5 to, the Insurance Code, relating to insurance, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance Adjuster Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB240 Dodd (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-11AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 10).
2019-07-03AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
2019-06-03AssemblyReferred to Com. on INS.
2019-05-21AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-20SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1158.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1033.) (May 13).
2019-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-04-29SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 850.) (April 24).
2019-04-11SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
2019-04-09SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2019-03-27SenateRe-referred to Com. on INS.
2019-03-14SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-02-12SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
2019-02-11SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Insurance Code14020Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code14022Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code14022.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code14023Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code14037Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code14046New CodeSee Bill Text
Insurance Code14047New CodeSee Bill Text
Insurance Code14064.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Insurance Code14065Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code1722Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback