CA SB240 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 72, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 25213.2 of the Government Code, relating to local government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County service areas: farmworker housing: County of Napa.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-29 - Assembly - SB 240 Dodd Senate Third Reading By AGUIAR-CURRY (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB240 Dodd et al (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-17 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 72, Statutes of 2017.
2017-07-17 Approved by the Governor.
2017-07-05SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
2017-06-29SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-06-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 60. Noes 1. Page 2404.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-06-15AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-06-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 14).
2017-05-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2017-04-04AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-04-03SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 582.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-03-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-03-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 537.) (March 29).
2017-03-08SenateSet for hearing March 29.
2017-02-16SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-02-07SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9.
2017-02-06SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code25213.2Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback