CA SB239 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 537, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 537, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1603.3 and 1644.5 of, to repeal Sections 1621.5, 120291, and 120292 of, and to repeal and add Section 120290 of, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 1001, 1001.1, and 1202.1 of, to add Sections 1170.21 and 1170.22 to, to repeal Sections 647f, 1001.10, 1001.11, and 1463.23 of, and to repeal and add Section 1202.6 of, the Penal Code, relating to infectious and communicable diseases.
Title
Infectious and communicable diseases: HIV and AIDS: criminal penalties.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] | Asm. Todd Gloria [D] | Sen. Toni Atkins [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] |
Sen. Susan Eggman [D] | Asm. Mike Gipson [D] | Sen. Holly Mitchell [D] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB239 Wiener et al. Concurrence (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-07 - Assembly - SB 239 Wiener Senate Third Reading By GLORIA (Y: 52 N: 19 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB239 Wiener et al (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-07 - Assembly - SB 239 Wiener Senate Third Reading By GLORIA (Y: 52 N: 19 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB239 Wiener et al (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 537, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 2691.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 19. Page 3035.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-08-28 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-28 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 5.) (August 23). |
2017-07-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 1339.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Published May 26 at 2 p.m. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1180.) (May 25). |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | April 24 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 514.) (March 28). |
2017-03-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 120290 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 120291 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 120292 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1603.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1621.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1644.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1001.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1001.10 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1001.11 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1170.21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 1170.22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 1202.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1463.23 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 647 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |