CA SB235 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11018.5, 100425, and 110065 of, to add Sections 110036, 110407, 110469, 110611, 111691, and 113091 to, to add Chapter 9 (commencing with Section 111920) to Part 5 of Division 104 of, and to repeal Section 111928.5 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to industrial hemp, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Industrial hemp products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Agriculture] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Agriculture] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Senate | Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Allen. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1184.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | May 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Set for hearing May 10. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 813.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 456.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Set for hearing March 10. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH, AGRI, and JUD. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 19. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 100425 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 110036 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 110065 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11018.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 110407 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 110469 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 110611 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 111691 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 111928.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 113091 | New Code | See Bill Text |