CA SB235 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 17052.12, 17250, 17276.20, 23609, 24349, and 24416.20 of, to add Sections 6377.1, 17053.76, 18153, 23622.9, and 24996 to, and to repeal and amend Sections 17053.80 and 23623 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and use taxes: income taxes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-03SenateReturned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2013-05-14SenateSet, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2013-05-08SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2013-05-02SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2013-05-01SenateSet, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2013-04-01SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2013-03-21SenateSet for hearing May 8.
2013-02-21SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2013-02-13SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
2013-02-12SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback