CA SB235 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 122, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 74209 to the Water Code, relating to water.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water conservation districts: reduction in number of

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-07-07 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB235 Negrete McLeod Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-01 - Assembly - SB 235 Negrete McLeod Senate Third Reading By GORDON (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB235 Negrete McLeod (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-07-25 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 122, Statutes of 2011.
2011-07-25 Approved by the Governor.
2011-07-11 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2011-07-07 Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 1. Page 1749.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2011-07-01 In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2011-07-01 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 11. Page 2162.) Ordered to the Senate.
2011-06-16 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2011-06-15 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 15).
2011-06-09 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2011-04-28 Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2011-03-29 In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2011-03-29 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 478.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2011-03-17 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2011-03-16 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 359.) (March 16).
2011-03-14 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2011-02-19 Set for hearing March 16.
2011-02-17 Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2011-02-10 From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
2011-02-09 Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code61500New CodeSee Bill Text
Water Code74209New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_235&sess=1112&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_235_bill_20110209_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_235_bill_20110314_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_235_bill_20110609_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_235_bill_20110708_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_235_bill_20110725_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_235_vote_20110316_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_235_vote_20110329_0224PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_235_vote_20110615_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_235_vote_20110701_0927AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_235_vote_20110707_0914AM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback