CA SB233 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 829, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 829, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 49069.3 and 49076 of the Education Code, and to amend Sections 361, 361.5, 366.1, 366.21, 366.22, 16010, and 16010.4 of, and to add Sections 16501.16 and 16519.7 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to foster child records.
Title
Foster children: records.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Tony Mendoza [D] | Sen. Andy Vidak [R] | Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB233 Beall et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Assembly - SB 233 Beall Senate Third Reading By RUBIO (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB233 Beall et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Assembly - SB 233 Beall Senate Third Reading By RUBIO (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB233 Beall et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 829, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-15 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-20 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2925.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-14 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3263.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-09-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2017-08-23 | Assembly | August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and ED. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1315.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Published May 26 at 10 a.m. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1179.) (May 25). |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 849.) (April 25). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 443.) (March 22). |
2017-03-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing March 22. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | March 15 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Set for hearing March 15. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 49069.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 49076 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 56055 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16010.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16501.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16501.16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16519.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16519.57 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16519.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 361 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 361.05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 361.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 366.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 366.21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 366.22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |