CA SB232 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 142, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 142, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 41326 of the Education Code, relating to school accountability.
Title
School accountability: California Collaborative for
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-16 - Assembly - SB 232 Hall Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB232 Hall (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB232 Hall (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 142, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-08-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2432.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-07-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 8). |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 839.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 417.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing March 25. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 41326 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 52074 | Amended Code | Citation Text |