CA SB23 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-30 - August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-30 - August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 465 to the Penal Code, relating to crime.
Title
Unlawful entry of a vehicle.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - 05/16/19 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB23 Wiener et al (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Result (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - 05/16/19 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB23 Wiener et al (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Result (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Assembly | August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 1. Page 1195.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1087.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | April 8 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 439.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Set for hearing March 26. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-12-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 465 | New Code | See Bill Text |