CA SB23 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 11270.5 to, and to repeal Section 11450.04 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to CalWORKs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CalWORKs: eligibility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB23 Mitchell (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-11-30AssemblyFrom Assembly without further action.
2016-11-30AssemblyDied on the inactive file.
2016-08-29AssemblyOrdered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
2016-08-16AssemblyFrom inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
2016-08-15AssemblyNotice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Cooper.
2015-09-04AssemblyOrdered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Holden.
2015-08-31AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-08-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 27).
2015-08-19AssemblyAugust 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2015-07-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-06-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on HUM. S.
2015-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2015-06-01SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 6. Page 1193.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2015-05-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1146.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 28.
2015-04-13SenateApril 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2015-04-02SenateSet for hearing April 13.
2015-03-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 416.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-02-03SenateSet for hearing March 24.
2015-01-15SenateReferred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2014-12-02SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
2014-12-01SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11270.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11450.04Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_23&sess=1516&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_23_bill_20141201_introduced.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_23_vote_20150324_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_23_vote_20150413_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_23_vote_20150528_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_23_vote_20150601_0632PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_23_vote_20150714_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_23_vote_20150827_000001_asm_comm.html

Bill Comments

feedback