CA SB227 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-08-16 - August 16 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-08-16 - August 16 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Chapter 2 (commencing with Section 2020) of Part 8 of Division 2 of the Labor Code, and to add Section 17140.6 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to unemployment.
Title
Unemployment: Excluded Workers Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB227 Durazo et al (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB227 Durazo et al (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-16 | Assembly | August 16 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 7. Page 1344.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1161.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 795.) (April 19). |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2023-03-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 306.) (March 8). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Set for hearing March 8. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and GOV. & F. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 19. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 2020 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17140.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |