CA SB223 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 699, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 699, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 49414.1 to the Education Code, relating to pupil health.
Title
Pupil health: administration of medicinal cannabis: schoolsites.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Sen. Monique Limon [D] | Sen. John Moorlach [R] |
Asm. Bill Quirk [D] | Asm. Christy Smith [D] | Sen. Jeff Stone [R] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB223 Hill et al. Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Assembly - 06/25/19 (Y: 7 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Assembly - SB 223 Hill Senate Third Reading By Smith (Y: 43 N: 22 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB223 Hill et al (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Assembly - 06/25/19 (Y: 7 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Assembly - SB 223 Hill Senate Third Reading By Smith (Y: 43 N: 22 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB223 Hill et al (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 699, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 7. Page 2326.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 43. Noes 22. Page 2846.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-26 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 25). |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 4. Page 476.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 438.) (March 26). |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing March 26. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 383.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Set for hearing March 20. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 49414.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |