CA SB221 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 4132 to the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to agricultural districts.
Title
Agricultural District 1-A: firearm and ammunition sales at the Cow Palace.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] | Asm. Marc Berman [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] |
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB221 Wiener et al. Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - SB 221 Wiener Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 44 N: 31 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB221 Wiener et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - SB 221 Wiener Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 44 N: 31 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB221 Wiener et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-28 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2018-09-28 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2018-09-06 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 6020.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 6013.) |
2018-08-28 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5880.) Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2018-08-28 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 44. Noes 31. Page 6583.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 8). |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | June 12 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4115.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4006.) (January 9). |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Set for hearing January 9. |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-01-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Set for hearing January 10. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | April 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 4132 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1367.47 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.92 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 1463.23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14132.04 | New Code | See Bill Text |