CA SB221 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 64, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend and repeal Section 116.221 of, and to add and repeal Section 116.224 of, the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to small claims court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Small claims court: jurisdiction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-27 - Assembly - SB 221 Simitian Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB221 Simitian (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-07-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 64, Statutes of 2011.
2011-07-07 Approved by the Governor.
2011-07-01 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
2011-06-27 In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2011-06-27 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2076.) Ordered to the Senate.
2011-06-22 Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2011-06-21 From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 21).
2011-06-09 Referred to Com. on JUD.
2011-06-01 In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2011-05-31 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1182.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2011-05-23 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2011-05-19 Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2011-05-18 Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading.
2011-05-17 Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2011-05-16 From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 950.) (May 10).
2011-05-02 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2011-04-29 Set for hearing May 10.
2011-04-12 Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2011-04-01 Set for hearing April 12.
2011-02-17 Referred to Com. on JUD.
2011-02-10 From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
2011-02-09 Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Code of Civil Procedure116.221Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_221&sess=1112&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_221_bill_20110209_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_221_bill_20110502_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_221_bill_20110517_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_221_bill_20110519_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_221_bill_20110628_enrolled.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_221_bill_20110628_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_221_bill_20110708_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_221_vote_20110510_000003_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_221_vote_20110531_0342PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_221_vote_20110621_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_221_vote_20110627_0136PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback