CA SB220 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
Pending: Senate Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 23320, 23320.5, and 23504 of, and to add Section 23661.4 to, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Section 32101 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Craft distillers: direct shipping.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-20SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2021-01-14SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 13.
2021-01-13SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback