CA SB217 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Set for hearing May 17.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 17 @ 9:00 am in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 51934 and 51938 of the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Comprehensive sexual health education and human immunodeficiency virus (HIV) prevention education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [04-14-2021]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - [03-10-2021] hearing: Motion to Reconsider. [Reconsideration Granted.] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-07SenateSet for hearing May 17.
2021-05-05SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-05-04SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 28).
2021-04-16SenateSet for hearing April 28.
2021-04-07SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2021-03-10SenateMarch 10 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 3.) Reconsideration granted.
2021-02-23SenateSet for hearing March 10.
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2021-01-14SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 13.
2021-01-13SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code51934Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code51938Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback