CA SB213 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 733, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 8712 of the Family Code, to amend Section 1522 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 16519.5 of, and to repeal and add Section 361.4 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to child placement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Placement of children: criminal records check.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-15 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB213 Mitchell Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Assembly - SB 213 Mitchell Senate Third Reading By STONE (Y: 58 N: 15 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-08 - Assembly - SB 213 Mitchell Senate Third Reading Amend By STONE Set #1 (Y: 54 N: 18 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB213 Mitchell Reconsider (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB213 Mitchell (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB213 Mitchell (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB213 Mitchell (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-12 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 733, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-12 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-22SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2017-09-15SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 3009.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-09-15SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2017-09-15AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 15. Page 3491.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-09-13AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (September 11).
2017-09-08AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 23. Page 3083.)
2017-09-08AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HUM. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2017-09-08AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2017-09-08AssemblyRead third time and amended. (Ayes 54. Noes 18. Page 3082.)
2017-09-08AssemblyAssembly Rule 69(b)(1) suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 24. Page 3067.)
2017-09-06AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-05AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-09-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 1).
2017-08-23AssemblyAugust 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-08-21AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-03AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-06-08AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD.
2017-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 12. Page 1282.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-30SenateReconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1282.)
2017-05-30SenateMotion to reconsider made by Senator Mitchell.
2017-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 1249.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1179.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-15SenateMay 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-05SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-03SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 851.) (April 25).
2017-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2017-04-13SenateApril 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-04-07SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2017-04-05SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 624.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-03-22SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2017-03-01SenateSet for hearing April 4.
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
2017-02-02SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 4.
2017-02-01SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback