CA SB212 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 5013, 5020, 5027, and 5028 of, and to add Sections 1018, 1019, 1020, 5010, 5032, and 5096 to, the Education Code, to amend Section 8141 of, to add Section 8141.3 to, and to add Division 22 (commencing with Section 24000) to, the Elections Code, to amend Sections 25040 and 25061 of, to add Section 25001 to, and to add Article 4 (commencing with Section 34910) to Chapter 4 of Part 1 of Division 2 of Title 4 of, the Government Code, relating to elections.
Title
Elections: local voting methods.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB212 Allen et al. Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Assembly - SB 212 Allen Senate Third Reading By Chiu (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB212 Allen (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Assembly - SB 212 Allen Senate Third Reading By Chiu (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB212 Allen (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Veto sustained. | |
2020-01-13 | Stricken from file. | |
2019-10-13 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2019-10-13 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2019-09-18 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 2833.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 3185.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (August 14). |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-09 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2019-06-25 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 1322.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 771.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 7. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 1018 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 1019 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 1020 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 5010 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 5013 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 5020 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 5027 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 5028 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 5032 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 5096 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 8141 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 8141.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 25001 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 25040 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 25061 | Amended Code | Citation Text |