CA SB212 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 141, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 141, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11379.6 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to controlled substances.
Title
Controlled substances: factors in aggravation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-16 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB212 Mendoza Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-09 - Assembly - SB 212 Mendoza Senate Third Reading By LACKEY (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB212 Mendoza (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-09 - Assembly - SB 212 Mendoza Senate Third Reading By LACKEY (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB212 Mendoza (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 141, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-08-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1981.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-07-09 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2328.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-07-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-07-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 30). |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1296.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1149.) (May 28). |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 11. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 594.) (April 14). |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 14. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | April 7 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 7. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | March 24 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing March 24. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11353.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11379.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |