CA SB212 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 69615.8 of the Education Code, relating to student financial aid, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Student financial aid: Assumption Program of Loans for
Sponsors
Sen. Fran Pavley [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-13 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Held in committee and under submission. |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 785.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 69615.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |