CA SB211 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 723, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 6056, 6086.15, 6094.5, 6140, 6140.2, 6141, 6141.3, 6145, 6213, 6216, and 6223 of, to add Section 6210.5 to, and to repeal Sections 6011 and 6069.5 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to attorneys.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Bar: board of trustees: reports: complaints: attorneys’ annual license fees: California Lawyers Association: Legal Services Trust Fund Commission: expenditure of funds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-08 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB211 Umberg Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-07 - Assembly - SB 211 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Stone (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB211 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 723, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-08 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-13 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2021-09-08SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2021-09-07SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2021-09-07AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Senate.
2021-09-02AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2021-09-02AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2021-07-15AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-07-14AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-07-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 13).
2021-05-20AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2021-05-10AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-05-10SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1064.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-05SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
2021-05-04SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 1019.) (May 4).
2021-04-21SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-04-14SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-04-07SenateSet for hearing May 4.
2021-03-18SenateRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-03-09SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-01-13SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 12.
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code6011Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code6056Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code6069.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code6086.15Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code6094.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code6140Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code6140.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code6141Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code6141.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code6145Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code6210.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code6213Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code6216Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code6223Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback