CA SB210 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-22 - Read third time and amended. (Page 6086.) Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-22 - Read third time and amended. (Page 6086.) Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1270, 1275, and 1318.1 of the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.
Title
Criminal procedure: release on defendant's own
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB210 Hancock (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB210 Hancock (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-22 | Read third time and amended. (Page 6086.) Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-08 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-07 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-06 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 3). | |
2012-06-25 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-06-12 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-04-12 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-01-26 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-01-26 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 2718.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-01-23 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-01-19 | Set for hearing January 19. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 2685.) (January 19). | |
2012-01-17 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-01-11 | Set for hearing January 17. | |
2012-01-10 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2624.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-01-04 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-12-15 | Set for hearing January 10. | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-02-09 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11. | |
2011-02-08 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1270 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1275 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1318.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 3417 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 6280 | New Code | See Bill Text |