CA SB21 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 5 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-06 - Set for hearing March 28.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Mar 28 @ 1:30 pm in 1021 O Street, Room 2100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 367.75 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to courts, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil actions: remote proceedings.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-06SenateSet for hearing March 28.
2023-02-23SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2023-01-18SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2022-12-06SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5.
2022-12-05SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Code of Civil Procedure367.75Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback