CA SB21 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-5)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-11 - August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-11 - August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 5166 to the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Specialized license plates: mental health awareness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB21 Glazer et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB21 Glazer et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-11 | Assembly | August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-01-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2820.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2794.) (January 20). |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Set for hearing January 20. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | May 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 3. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 779.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 13. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2020-12-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7. |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 5166 | New Code | See Bill Text |