CA SB21 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 15 (commencing with Section 54999.8) to Part 1 of Division 2 of Title 5 of the Government Code, relating to law enforcement agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law enforcement agencies: surveillance: policies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB21 Hill et al (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-01AssemblySeptember 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2017-08-23AssemblyAugust 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-08-21AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-13AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (July 11).
2017-07-03AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2017-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2017-06-12AssemblyReferred to Coms. on PUB. S. and P. & C.P.
2017-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 15. Page 1312.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenatePublished May 26 at 10 a.m.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1176.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-15SenateMay 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-05SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-03SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 850.) (April 25).
2017-04-17SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2017-03-23SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-03-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 429.) (March 21).
2017-03-14SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-03-07SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-03-01SenateSet for hearing March 21.
2017-01-12SenateReferred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
2016-12-06SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5.
2016-12-05SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code54999.8New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback