CA SB21 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 5523 to the Fish and Game Code, relating to fishing.
Title
Fishing gear.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-25 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB21 Simitian (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-23 - Assembly - SB 21 Simitian Senate Third Reading By HUFFMAN (Y: 51 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - SENATE 3RD READING SB21 SIMITIAN (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-20 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-23 - Assembly - SB 21 Simitian Senate Third Reading By HUFFMAN (Y: 51 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - SENATE 3RD READING SB21 SIMITIAN (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-20 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-29 | In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto) | |
2010-09-29 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2010-09-03 | Enrolled. To Governor at 11:45 a.m. | |
2010-08-25 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 22. Noes 11. Page 4907.) To enrollment. | |
2010-08-24 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2010-08-23 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 6533.) To Senate. | |
2010-08-19 | Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 28. Page 6372.) | |
2010-08-18 | Read third time. Amended. (Page 6323.) To third reading. | |
2010-07-01 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-06-30 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on June 30). | |
2010-06-16 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 15.) | |
2010-06-10 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. | |
2010-02-11 | To Com. on W.,P. & W. | |
2010-01-28 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2010-01-28 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 2730.) To Assembly. | |
2010-01-25 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |
2010-01-21 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 2693.) | |
2010-01-20 | Set for hearing January 21. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |
2009-05-28 | Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |
2009-05-22 | Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |
2009-04-20 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |
2009-04-14 | Set for hearing April 20. | |
2009-03-25 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-03-24 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 340.) | |
2009-03-12 | Set for hearing March 24. | |
2009-01-29 | To Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2008-12-02 | From print. May be acted upon on or after January 1. | |
2008-12-01 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |