CA SB208 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-17 - Set for hearing March 16.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Water Committee
Hearing: Mar 16 @ 9:00 am in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 33302 of, and to amend, repeal, and add Section 33350 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to resource conservation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sierra Nevada Conservancy: Sierra Nevada Region: subregion: definitions: annual report.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-17SenateSet for hearing March 16.
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2021-01-13SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 12.
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code33302Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code33350New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback