CA SB204 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 98, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 98, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 6 (commencing with Section 6450) to Division 10 of the Family Code, relating to domestic violence.
Title
Domestic violence: protective orders.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-07-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB204 Dodd et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-06 - Assembly - SB 204 Dodd Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB204 Dodd et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-06 - Assembly - SB 204 Dodd Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB204 Dodd et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 98, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-07-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2017-07-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1936.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-07-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2473.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1223.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | May 15 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 851.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Family Code | 6450 | New Code | See Bill Text |