CA SB202 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 558, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 558, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 9016 of the Elections Code, and to repeal Section 1 of Chapter 732 of the Statutes of 2010, relating to elections.
Title
Elections: ballot measures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-10 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SB202 Hancock Concurrence (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-09 - Assembly - SB 202 Hancock Senate Third Reading By GORDON (Y: 45 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-09-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-09 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-02 - Assembly - SB 202 Hancock Senate Third Reading By GORDON Amend By GORDON Set #1 (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-08-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB202 Hancock (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-09 - Assembly - SB 202 Hancock Senate Third Reading By GORDON (Y: 45 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-09-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-09 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-02 - Assembly - SB 202 Hancock Senate Third Reading By GORDON Amend By GORDON Set #1 (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-08-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB202 Hancock (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 558, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-16 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2011-09-10 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 2486.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-09-09 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 2464.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 2498.) | |
2011-09-09 | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 3172.) From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 9). Consent granted to take up without reference to file. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 45. Noes 30. Page 3187.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-09-08 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. | |
2011-09-02 | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2813.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. | |
2011-08-22 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-18 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 17). | |
2011-07-06 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-09 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | |
2011-06-01 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-05-31 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 1176.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-18 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-17 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1013.) (May 16). | |
2011-05-06 | Set for hearing May 16. | |
2011-05-04 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 852.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-08 | Set for hearing May 3. | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | |
2011-02-09 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11. | |
2011-02-08 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 9001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9016 | Amended Code | Citation Text |