CA SB201 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 854, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 3562 of the Government Code, relating to higher education employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Education Employer-Employee Relations Act: employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-07 - Assembly - SB 201 Skinner Senate Third Reading By AGUIAR-CURRY (Y: 52 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB201 Skinner et al (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-15 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 854, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-15 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-14SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2017-09-08SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-09-07AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 3043.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-09-05AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 1).
2017-09-01AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-06-28AssemblyJune 28 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-06-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2017-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 1266.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1179.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-04-17SenateApril 17 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2017-03-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-17SenateSet for hearing March 27.
2017-03-13SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2017-02-01SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3.
2017-01-31SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code3562Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback