CA SB20 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 240, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 240, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11011.24 of the Government Code, relating to surplus state property, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Surplus state property: Napa County Regional Park and Open Space District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-22 - Assembly - SB 20 Dodd Senate Third Reading By Aguiar-Curry (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB20 Dodd et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB20 Dodd et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 240, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-08-22 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2805.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1163.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1087.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | April 8 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 331.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Set for hearing March 12. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2018-12-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 11011.24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |