CA SB20 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 415, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 415, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal and add Section 114094 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to food facilities.
Title
Food facilities: menu labeling.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-08 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB20 Padilla Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - Assembly - SB 20 Padilla Senate Third Reading By LARA (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-09-02 - Assembly - SB 20 Padilla Senate Third Reading By LARA Amend By LARA Set #1 (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-08-17 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB20 Padilla (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - Assembly - SB 20 Padilla Senate Third Reading By LARA (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-09-02 - Assembly - SB 20 Padilla Senate Third Reading By LARA Amend By LARA Set #1 (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-08-17 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB20 Padilla (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 415, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-14 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2011-09-08 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 2404.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-09-07 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2011-09-07 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2990.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-09-02 | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2811.) Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-31 | Read third time and amended. (Page 2709.) Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-22 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-18 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 17). | |
2011-08-15 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-06 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-29 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2011-06-21 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-06-09 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2011-05-27 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-05-27 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 1140.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-18 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-17 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2011-05-06 | Set for hearing May 16. | |
2011-05-05 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 885.) (May 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-29 | Set for hearing May 4. | |
2011-04-28 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2011-04-25 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-12-07 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 6. | |
2010-12-06 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 114094 | Amended Code | Citation Text |