CA SB2 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - June 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 10.5 (commencing with Section 66810) to Part 40 of Division 5 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to student data.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Statewide Longitudinal Student Database.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB2 Glazer et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17AssemblyJune 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-06-06AssemblyReferred to Coms. on ED. and HIGHER ED.
2019-05-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-28SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1335.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-23SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-05-23SenateRead third time and amended.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1086.) (May 16).
2019-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-04-29SenateApril 29 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-18SenateSet for hearing April 29.
2019-04-10SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 547.) (April 3).
2019-03-07SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2019-01-16SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-12-04SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
2018-12-03SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code66810New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback