CA SB2 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 364, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 27388.1 to the Government Code, and to add Chapter 2.5 (commencing with Section 50470) to Part 2 of Division 31 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Building Homes and Jobs Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-15 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB2 Atkins et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Assembly - SB 2 Atkins Third Reading Urgency By GRAY (Y: 54 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB2 Atkins et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-29 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 364, Statutes of 2017.
2017-09-29 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-21SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m.
2017-09-15SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 2957.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-09-15SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2017-09-14AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3415.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-08-31AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2017-08-31AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2017-08-31AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 23. Page 2826.)
2017-08-29AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-07-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-07-10AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 47. Noes 24. Page 2493.)
2017-07-10AssemblyReferred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2017-07-06AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-07-06SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 1894.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenatePublished May 26 at 10 a.m.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1175.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-04-03SenateApril 3 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-03-24SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2017-03-23SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-21SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 371.) (March 15).
2017-03-09SenateSet for hearing March 15.
2017-03-07SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-03-07SenateSet for hearing March 15.
2017-03-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 9. Noes 3. Page 288.) (February 28). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-02-22SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2017-02-22SenateSet for hearing February 28.
2017-01-12SenateReferred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
2016-12-06SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5.
2016-12-05SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code27388.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code50408Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code50470New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback