CA SB197 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 567, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 567, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1335, 1337, and 1341 of the Penal Code, relating to domestic violence.
Title
Domestic violence proceedings: conditional examination
Sponsors
Sen. John Benoit [R] | Sen. Fran Pavley [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-09-08 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB197 Pavley (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-02 - Assembly - SB 197 Pavley Senate Third Reading By ARAMBULA (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB197 Pavley (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-02 - Assembly - SB 197 Pavley Senate Third Reading By ARAMBULA (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB197 Pavley (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 567, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by Governor. | |
2009-09-25 | Enrolled. To Governor at 10:30 a.m. | |
2009-09-08 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2285.) To enrollment. | |
2009-09-03 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2009-09-02 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2885.) To Senate. | |
2009-08-31 | Read third time. Amended. (Page 2827.) To third reading. | |
2009-07-16 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-07-15 | Read second time. Amended. To second reading. | |
2009-07-14 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30.) | |
2009-06-17 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-05-14 | To Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-05-06 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-05-06 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 795.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-04 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-04-30 | Read third time. Amended. To second reading. | |
2009-04-23 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |
2009-04-22 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 480.) | |
2009-04-03 | Set for hearing April 14. | |
2009-03-09 | To Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-02-24 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | |
2009-02-23 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |