CA SB196 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 669, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 669, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 75.11, 402.1, and 532 of, and to add and repeal Section 214.18 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Property taxes: community land trust.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB196 Beall et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 196 Beall Senate Third Reading By Petrie-Norris (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB196 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 196 Beall Senate Third Reading By Petrie-Norris (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB196 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 669, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-18 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2867.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3333.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | July 1 hearing: Heard for testimony only. |
2019-06-24 | Assembly | June 24 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1272.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1092.) (May 16). |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 902.) (May 1). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 214.18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 402.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 532 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 75.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |