CA SB193 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 11.2 to the Monterey County Water Resources Agency Act (Chapter 1159 of the Statutes of 1990), relating to water, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Monterey County Water Resources Agency: Lake Nacimiento and Lake San Antonio: white bass.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | April 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and APPR. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 2. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 10723 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180SB193 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180SB193 |