CA SB191 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 5.5 (commencing with Section 5920) to Division 5 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to pupil health.
Title
Pupil health: mental health and substance use disorder services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | April 24 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 624.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 371.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Set for hearing March 15. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HEALTH. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 2. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5920 | New Code | See Bill Text |