CA SB19 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 421, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 9810 of, to add Chapter 3.1 (commencing with Section 19225) to Division 8 of, and to repeal and amend Section 205 of, the Business and Professions Code, to add Article 2.9 (commencing with Section 759) to Chapter 5 of Division 3 of the Harbors and Navigation Code, to amend Sections 303, 309, and 321 of, to amend and repeal Sections 5503.5, 5505, 5507, and 5509 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 212, 5503, 5506, 5508, 5511, and 5512 of, to add Sections 307.2, 307.5, 307.6, 314.6, 633, and 912.3 to, to add Article 6 (commencing with Section 4025) to Chapter 2.5 of, to add Article 2 (commencing with Section 4675) to Chapter 4.5 of, and to add Article 10 (commencing with Section 5340) to Chapter 7 of, to repeal Chapter 2.5 (commencing with Section 4000) of, to repeal Chapter 4.5 (commencing with Section 4660) of, and to repeal Chapter 7 (commencing with Section 5101) of, Division 2 of, the Public Utilities Code, and to amend, repeal, and add Section 34505.7 of, and to add Division 14.86 (commencing with Section 34680) to, the Vehicle Code, relating to the Public Utilities Commission, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Utilities Commission: duties and responsibilities: governance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-15 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB19 Hill et al. Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Assembly - SB 19 Hill Senate Third Reading By LEVINE (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB19 Hill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-02 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 421, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-02 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-22SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2017-09-15SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3012.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-09-15SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2017-09-15AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3489.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-09-13AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-12AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2017-09-12AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2017-09-12AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 21. Page 3223.)
2017-09-11AssemblySeptember 11 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-09-08AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on U. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2017-09-08AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2017-09-08AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2017-09-06AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-05AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-09-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1).
2017-08-23AssemblyAugust 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-06-22AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-06-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-06-12AssemblyReferred to Coms. on U. & E. and JUD.
2017-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1312.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenatePublished May 26 at 10 a.m.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1176.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-04-24SenateApril 24 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-04-18SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2017-04-17SenateApril 17 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-04-07SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2017-04-06SenateRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-06SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2017-04-05SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 625.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-03-31SenateSet for hearing April 4.
2017-03-21SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 429.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-03-14SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2017-03-09SenateSet for hearing March 21.
2017-01-12SenateReferred to Coms. on E., U. & C., JUD., and RLS.
2016-12-06SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5.
2016-12-05SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code19225New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code205Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code9810Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code13979.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Harbors and Navigation Code759New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code1044New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code1759Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code212New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code303Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code307.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code307.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code307.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code308Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code309Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code314.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code321Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code5503New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code5503.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code5505Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code5506New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code5507Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code5508New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code5509Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code5511New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code5512New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code632Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code8331New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code912.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Vehicle Code34505.7New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback