CA SB188 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 6245 to the Public Resources Code, relating to state lands.
Title
State lands: leasing: oil and gas.
Sponsors
Sen. Hannah-Beth Jackson [D] | Sen. Kevin de Leon [D] | Sen. Ricardo Lara [D] | Sen. Monique Limon [D] |
Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D] | Asm. Richard Bloom [D] | Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D] | Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB188 Jackson (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB188 Jackson (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-01 | Assembly | September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2017-08-23 | Assembly | August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (July 10). |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 643.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 362.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Set for hearing March 14. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 25. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 179.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 6245 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 6501.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |