CA SB185 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1463.007 of the Penal Code, and to amend Sections 12807, 13365, 40508, 40509, 40509.5, and 40903 of, and to add Sections 40500.5 and 42003.5 to, the Vehicle Code, relating to infractions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes: infractions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB185 Hertzberg et al (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-01AssemblySeptember 1 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-08-23AssemblyAugust 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-07-03AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended.
2017-07-03AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended.
2017-06-15AssemblyReferred to Coms. on TRANS. and PUB. S.
2017-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 6. Page 1338.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenatePublished May 26 at 2 p.m.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-15SenateMay 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-03SenateMay 8 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-01SenateSet for hearing May 8.
2017-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 854.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-07SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2017-04-05SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 12. Noes 1. Page 627.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-03-20SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2017-03-14SenateSet for hearing April 4.
2017-02-02SenateReferred to Coms. on T. & H. and PUB. S.
2017-01-26SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 25.
2017-01-25SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code1463.007Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code12807Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code13365Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code40500.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Vehicle Code40508Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code40509Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code40509.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code40903Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code42003.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback