CA SB180 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 79, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 79, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1770 of the Civil Code, relating to consumer affairs.
Title
Consumer transactions: public social services:
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-07-05 - Assembly - SB 180 Corbett Senate Third Reading By COOK (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB180 Corbett (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB180 Corbett (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 79, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-07-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-07-07 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2011-07-05 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-07-05 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2190.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-06-30 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-06-29 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 29). | |
2011-06-28 | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 2091.) | |
2011-06-08 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-05-23 | Referred to Com. on V.A. | |
2011-05-05 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-05-05 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 878.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-03 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-05-02 | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 764.) (April 26). | |
2011-04-14 | Set for hearing April 26. | |
2011-04-13 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 644.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-03-29 | Set for hearing April 12. | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Com. on JUD. Re-referred to Coms. on V.A. and JUD. | |
2011-02-08 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. | |
2011-02-07 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1770 | Amended Code | Citation Text |