CA SB18 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-25 - Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-25 - Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 307.1 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to the Public Utilities Commission.
Title
Public Utilities Commission: outside counsel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB18 Hill Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Assembly - SB 18 Hill Senate Third Reading By MULLIN (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB18 Hill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Assembly - SB 18 Hill Senate Third Reading By MULLIN (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB18 Hill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-25 | Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2015-10-09 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2015-10-09 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m. |
2015-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2774.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3090.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | From consent calendar by Assembly Member Cristina Garcia. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-07-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 8). |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 22). |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | June 15 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1117.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended. |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 724.) (April 21). |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 21. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | April 7 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 7. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2014-12-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1. |
2014-12-01 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 4216.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 1702.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2104.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 307.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 307.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 320.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |