CA SB18 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 551, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 551, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to Medi-Cal, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Medi-Cal renewal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB18 Leno Concurrence (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - Assembly - SB 18 Leno Senate Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 55 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB18 Hernandez (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - Assembly - SB 18 Leno Senate Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 55 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB18 Hernandez (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 551, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-04 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 4948.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | Set for hearing August 27. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 4924.) |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4868.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-08-22 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 21. Page 6232.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-08-13 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 867.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 790.) (May 1). |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2012-12-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3. |
2012-12-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 127660 | Amended Code | Citation Text |