CA SB178 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 651, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 3.6 (commencing with Section 1546) to Title 12 of Part 2 of the Penal Code, relating to privacy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Privacy: electronic communications: search warrant.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-09-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB178 Leno Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Assembly - SB 178 Leno Senate Third Reading By OBERNOLTE (Y: 57 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB178 Leno (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-10-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 651, Statutes of 2015.
2015-10-08 Approved by the Governor.
2015-09-11SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:45 p.m.
2015-09-09SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 4. Page 2644.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2015-09-08SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2015-09-08AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 13. Page 2974.) Ordered to the Senate.
2015-09-04AssemblyAction rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2015-09-04AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2015-08-31AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-08-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2015-08-19AssemblyAugust 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2015-08-17AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-07-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-07-07AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2015-06-24AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2015-06-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 23).
2015-06-11AssemblyReferred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and PUB. S.
2015-06-04AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2015-06-03SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1301.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2015-06-02SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2015-06-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1148.) (May 28).
2015-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 28.
2015-04-27SenateApril 27 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2015-04-22SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-04-17SenateSet for hearing April 27.
2015-04-15SenateApril 20 hearing postponed by committee.
2015-04-10SenateSet for hearing April 20.
2015-03-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 404.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-03-16SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2015-03-06SenateSet for hearing March 24.
2015-02-19SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2015-02-10SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
2015-02-09SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code1546New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_178&sess=1516&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_178_bill_20150209_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_178_bill_20150316_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_178_bill_20150422_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_178_bill_20150602_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_178_bill_20150624_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_178_bill_20150707_amended_asm_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_178_bill_20150817_amended_asm_v93.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_178_bill_20150828_amended_asm_v92.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_178_bill_20150904_amended_asm_v91.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_178_bill_20150910_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_178_bill_20151008_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_178_vote_20150324_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_178_vote_20150528_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_178_vote_20150603_0400PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_178_vote_20150623_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_178_vote_20150427_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_178_vote_20150714_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_178_vote_20150827_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_178_vote_20150908_0450PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_178_vote_20150909_0559PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback