CA SB178 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 564, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 564, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 14673.9 to the Government Code, relating to state property, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
State property: Department of Forestry and Fire
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-09-08 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB178 Aanestad (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-02 - Assembly - SB 178 Aanestad Senate Third Reading By NIELSEN (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-03 - Senate - Special Consent #8 SB178 Aanestad (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-02 - Assembly - SB 178 Aanestad Senate Third Reading By NIELSEN (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-03 - Senate - Special Consent #8 SB178 Aanestad (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 564, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by Governor. | |
2009-09-25 | Enrolled. To Governor at 10:30 a.m. | |
2009-09-08 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2274.) To enrollment. | |
2009-09-03 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2009-09-02 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2938.) To Senate. | |
2009-08-31 | Read third time. Amended. (Page 2825.) To third reading. | |
2009-08-27 | From Consent Calendar to third reading. | |
2009-08-24 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-08-20 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 19.) | |
2009-07-23 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-07 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 7.) | |
2009-06-30 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-06-18 | To Com. on B. & P. | |
2009-06-03 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-06-03 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1188.) To Assembly. | |
2009-06-01 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-05-28 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 1068.) Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-22 | Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |
2009-05-21 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-11 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |
2009-05-01 | Set for hearing May 11. | |
2009-04-28 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 680.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-03-27 | Set for hearing April 28. | |
2009-03-09 | To Com. on G.O. | |
2009-02-18 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |
2009-02-17 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |