CA SB176 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on August 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 155, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on August 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 155, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1347 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes.
Title
Examining children as witnesses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB176 Mitchell Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-06 - Assembly - SB 176 Mitchell Senate Third Reading By LACKEY (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB176 Mitchell (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-06 - Assembly - SB 176 Mitchell Senate Third Reading By LACKEY (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB176 Mitchell (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 155, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-08-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2015-07-09 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1872.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-07-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2258.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-07-02 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 16). |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-04-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 558.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 507.) (April 7). |
2015-03-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 7. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | March 24 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing March 24. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1347 | Amended Code | Citation Text |