CA SB174 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 8266.1 and 8447 of, and to amend, repeal, and add Sections 8265, 8265.5, and 8357 of, the Education Code, relating to early childhood education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Early childhood education: reimbursement rates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-17SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-05-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 16).
2019-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-13SenateMay 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-04-30SenateMay 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-04-26SenateSet for hearing May 6.
2019-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 796.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-26SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2019-03-20SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2019-01-29SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 28.
2019-01-28SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code8265Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code8265.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code8265.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code8266.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code8357Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code8447Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback