CA SB174 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-27 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-27 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 241 and 1020 of the Government Code, relating to citizens of the state.
Title
Citizens of the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB174 Lara et al. Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Assembly - SB 174 Lara Senate Third Reading By GONZALEZ FLETCHER (Y: 46 N: 26 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB174 Lara Urgency Clause (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Assembly - SB 174 Lara Senate Third Reading By GONZALEZ FLETCHER (Y: 46 N: 26 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB174 Lara Urgency Clause (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-27 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2018-09-27 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 5686.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-23 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 5674.) |
2018-08-22 | Senate | Set for hearing August 23. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5536.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2018-08-21 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 46. Noes 26. Page 6405.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-07-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (July 3). |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2017-08-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2227.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2183.) (August 21). |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Set for hearing August 21. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 2102.) (July 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Set for hearing July 18 in E., U. & C. pending receipt. |
2017-07-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-07-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-07-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | April 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 515.) (March 28). |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and EQ. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 1020 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 241 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 4000.15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 4156 | Amended Code | Citation Text |