CA SB17 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 603, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 603, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1385.045 and 127280 of, to add Section 1367.243 to, to add Chapter 9 (commencing with Section 127675) to Part 2 of Division 107 of, and to repeal Section 127686 of, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 10181.45 of, and to add Section 10123.205 to, the Insurance Code, relating to health care.
Title
Health care: prescription drug costs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB17 Hernandez et al. Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Assembly - SB 17 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By WOOD (Y: 66 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB17 Hernandez et al (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Assembly - SB 17 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By WOOD (Y: 66 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB17 Hernandez et al (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 603, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-13 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 8. Page 2837.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-12 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 9. Page 3167.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (September 1). |
2017-08-23 | Assembly | August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 1262.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1176.) (May 25). |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | May 8 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 807.) (April 19). |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-12-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5. |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 127280 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 127675 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 127686 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1367.243 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1367.245 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1385.045 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.204 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.205 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10181.45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |